Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Miller
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness Equipment; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding which members of the population would benefit from the implementation of an income tax credit to purchase electric generators or a tax-free period for emergency preparedness equipment, and other matters; requiring a report on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {965869/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559538/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {965869/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 51
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {559538/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM