Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Newborn Screening Program - Krabbe Leukodystrophy
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene's Newborn Screening Program include screening for Krabbe leukodystrophy.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM