Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Administrative Hearing - Reimbursement of Costs and Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring under the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights that a hearing board award specified costs and fees, including attorney's fees, to a law enforcement officer after a finding of not guilty.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page