Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption From Watershed Protection and Restoration Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Elliott, Ready, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting a county or municipality that maintains adequate program funding to support infrastructure and programs required under a specified permit from the requirement to adopt a watershed protection and restoration program under specified circumstances; and requiring the Department of the Environment to a make a specified determination and provide specified notice under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM