Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the procedures for terminating an easement purchased by the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation; establishing specified criteria to be considered by a county governing body and the Foundation for approving or denying a termination of an easement; requiring a county governing body to provide public notice of and to conduct a public hearing on the termination request; providing for the effect of a county governing body's denial of a request to terminate an easement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {583428/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 30
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 30
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Floor Amendment {583428/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 31
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 33
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Rules 32
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text - Chapter - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-514 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM