Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz and Adams
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date for the start of the term for a member elected to serve on the Talbot County Board of Education from January 1 to December 1 after the member's election.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0171
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text - Chapter - Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-12A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM