Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Knotts, Angel, Hill, Jackson, and Krimm
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner of appointing commissioners to the Public Service Commission by requiring that each commissioner reside in and represent one of five specified areas of the State; adjusting the process by which the Chairman is appointed by requiring that the Chairman be appointed by the Governor from among the commissioners; providing that the term of the Chairman is coterminous with the individual's term as a commissioner; and providing for the application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Membership
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   2-102, 2-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page