Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Beidle, DeBoy, Hogan, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the fine from $25 to $75 for failing to secure a child under a specified age in a child safety seat or seat belt while transporting the child in a motor vehicle or operating a motor vehicle; and repealing a requirement that court costs are included in a specified fine.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0192
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0343 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-412.2, 22-412.3, 27-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM