Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from attempting to deliver a telecommunication device to a person detained or confined in a specified place of confinement; making it a felony instead of a misdemeanor to commit a specified offense; and altering a penalty.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0113
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM