Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Standards and Workload Guidelines for Teachers and Related Services Providers
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, A. Washington, and Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to adopt regulations that establish workload guidelines for special education teachers and related services providers; requring the State Board to conduct a specified analysis of the administrative responsibilities of special education teachers and make specified recommendations beginning with the 2016-2017 school year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-404, 8-404.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM