Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a transfer of a minimum security inmate from a State correctional facility to a local correctional facility be for participation in community-oriented correctional programs; and authorizing the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to make a specified transfer.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0115
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/06/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM