Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas Bond
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the amount of a supersedeas bond required to stay the enforcement of a judgment in a civil action; authorizing a court to reduce further the amount of a supersedeas bond; providing a procedure by which an appellee may seek discovery for the limited purpose of determining whether an appellant has dissipated or diverted assets under specified circumstances; requiring a circuit court to retain jurisdiction over a specified action for a specified limited purpose; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0301
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882116/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138579/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator DeGrange) Rejected (20-21)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-10)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-19)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {882116/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {138579/2 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Motion Special Order until later today (Senator DeGrange) Rejected (20-21) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-10) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (118-19) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM