Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current Employees
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Comptroller)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified appointing authorities in the State Personnel Management System to require specified prospective or current employees to provide specified information, for at least the previous 5-year period, for a specified background investigation; authorizing specified appointing authorities to request from the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository a State and national criminal history records check for specified prospective and current employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924264/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {574063/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {924264/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 37
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {574063/1 Adopted 37
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Finance 40
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM