Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a license issued by the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners entitles an individual to provide massage therapy treatment; requiring a person to hold a certain permit before establishing or operating a massage therapy establishment in the State; providing that these permits are not transferable and shall be displayed conspicuously; authorizing the Board to perform certain inspections; requiring the Board to provide assistance to the Maryland Human Trafficking Task Force, law enforcement, and others; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101, 6-102, 6-202, 6-206, 6-301 through 6-303, 6-306, 6-308, 6-311, 6-3A-01 through 6-3A-13, 6-401, 6-501, 6-502, 6-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM