Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsored by
Delegate Afzali
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Plumbing to adopt standards of the International Code Council as part of the State Plumbing Code; requiring the Board to periodically review specified standards of the International Code Council; requiring the Board to amend the State Plumbing Code to incorporate specified standards for a water conserving appliance, device, fitting, or fixture under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0211
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0361 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM