Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing local jurisdictions to use one speed monitoring system at the intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) in Prince George's County, subject to certain placement and signage and device requirements; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530610/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {273221/2 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-45)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-44)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302-18
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {530610/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {273221/2 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (91-45) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48C
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 51
Senate 3/27/2018 3/27/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {188172/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (94-44) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Text - Chapter - Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM