Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Clark, and Rey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts in the community of Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls, St. Mary's County; providing that a person who operates a golf cart in Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls may operate the golf cart only on specified roads, between dawn and dusk, and only if the golf cart is equipped with specified lighting; authorizing the St. Mary's County Department of Public Works and Transportation to designate the specified highways on which a person may operate a golf cart; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0299
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {480018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {480018/1 Adopted 30
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-402, 21-104.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM