Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Managed Honey Bee Colonies
Sponsored by
Delegates McKay, Beitzel, and Buckel
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting an individual who kills or wounds a black bear in defense of the life of a honey bee in a honey bee colony managed by the individual on the individual's property from specified penalties, subject to a specified exception; and establishing that the exemption applies only if the individual has installed and properly maintained an electric fence.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {210719/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Rejected (49-81)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {483626/1 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194237/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-19)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Bee Colonies
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {210719/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Rejected (49-81) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {483626/1 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Managed Honey Bee Colonies
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {194237/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (122-19) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Managed Honey Bee Colonies
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Text - Chapter - Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Managed Honey Bee Colonies
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page