Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Kipke, Oaks, West, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to be the Maryland Department of Health; renaming the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to be the Secretary of Health; providing that the Maryland Department of Health is the successor of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; providing that specified names and titles of a specified unit and officials in laws and other documents mean the names and titles of the successor unit and officials; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0082
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486088/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {486088/1 Adopted 21
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 23
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Finance 24
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-101, 2-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM