Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of freight from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; establishing certain penalties; providing a railroad company is solely responsible for the actions of its agents or employees in certain violations; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to provide certain notice to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0381 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Saab) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {713823/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (37-84)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767578/1
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767578/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-30)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {943926/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-28)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {683327/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (12-28)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767578/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-37)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Saab) Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Amendment {713823/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (37-84) 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {767578/1 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {767578/1 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-30) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {943926/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-28) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {683327/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (12-28) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {767578/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Serafini) Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM