Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Morhaim, Stein, Stukes, Walker, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, in consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to establish a wellness pilot project in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; requiring the wellness pilot project to achieve savings through participation in qualified programs by State employees and their dependents; establishing the dates on which the wellness pilot project begins and ends; requiring participation in the wellness pilot project to be voluntary; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0843
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations and Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations and Health and Government Operations)
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM