Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Licensed Physicians - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Beitzel, Cluster, Frush, Hill, Jalisi, Kelly, Kipke, Lam, Morgan, Rose, Stein, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Physicians from establishing a continuing education requirement that every licensed physician complete a specific course or program as a condition to the renewal of a license.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 35
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 54
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM