Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Veterans Affairs) and Delegates Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to maintain the operation of the Charlotte Hall Veterans Home; requiring the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to administer the Fund for staff salaries and benefits, physical improvements to the Home, and specified operating expenses; prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, any unspent portions of the Fund from being transferred to or reverting to the General Fund of the State; specifying the contents of the fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956684/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {956684/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 54
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM