Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, Szeliga, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, S. Howard, Jacobs, Krebs, W. Miller, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to accept a criminal background investigation performed on behalf of an armored car company in place of a specified criminal history records check performed by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0261
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0283 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {302817/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {418570/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {302817/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {418570/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM