Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing obsolete provisions of law that required certain insurers to provide the Maryland Insurance Commissioner with certain information and documents regarding slavery era insurance policies and required the Commissioner to issue a certain report on slavery era insurance policies; and requiring a copy of the 2012 report be made available on the Maryland Insurance Administration's website and a copy be maintained at the Thurgood Marshall Library at the University of Maryland School of Law.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803597/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {803597/1 Adopted 21
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Text - Third - Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - Repeal
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 25
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Referred Finance 26
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   30-101, 30-101 through 30-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM