Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain individuals who sign individual tax returns as preparers are not exempt from the requirement to register with the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21
Text - Third - State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 23
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred Finance 24
Senate 2/26/2018 2/27/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text - Chapter - State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM