Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, Brooks, Cassilly, Folden, Frush, Gutierrez, Jackson, Proctor, Shoemaker, Smith, Vogt, C. Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making specified provisions of law relating to the Motor Vehicle Administration's collection and electronic forwarding of Selective Service registration information gender neutral and expanding their applicability to specified minors; repealing provisions relating to the refusal of an applicant for specified documents to consent to Selective Service registration; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0072
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0088 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM