Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Chang, Gutierrez, Jackson, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child to order the child to be held in a secure juvenile facility pending a criminal trial except under specified circumstances; and requiring the court to state the reasons on the record for a finding that detention in a secure juvenile facility would pose a risk of harm to the child or others.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM