Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Fennell, Angel, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Barron, Campos, Ebersole, Glenn, Holmes, Jackson, Jalisi, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, McCray, Morales, Patterson, Proctor, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, A. Washington, P. Young, and Metzgar
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program in Prince George's County; requiring the Prince George's Board of Education, after consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to implement the Program for 125 students in public high schools in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of Education to collaborate with specified local community organizations; specifying the purpose of the Program; requiring the Board of Education to report annually; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0295
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {785866/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {785866/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Manno) Adopted 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-415.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM