Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program - Establishment (Peyton's Bill)
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Afzali, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, and A. Miller
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program to provide grants to public schools to purchase technology to allow students with medical conditions to participate in classrooms remotely if in-person attendance is not possible; requiring the State Department of Education to implement and administer the Program; authorizing the Governor to include in the State budget an appropriation to the Program; and authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0485
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295260/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {273025/1 (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program - Establishment (Peyton's Bill)
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {295260/1 Adopted 28
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Floor Amendment {273025/1 (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted 28
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Education - Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program - Establishment (Peyton's Bill)
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-124 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM