Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
District Court Electronic Citation Fund and Fee
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell, Cluster, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing court costs in District Court traffic and criminal cases from $22.50 to $27.50; requiring the Comptroller to pay annually from court costs in District Court traffic and criminal cases $3 per case into the District Court Electronic Citation Fund; requiring the Comptroller to pay from court costs in District Court traffic and criminal cases $2 per case to the arresting law enforcement agency for a specified purpose; establishing the District Court Electronic Citation Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0190 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM