Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a member of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System who is subject to the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit is eligible to purchase service credit for a specified period of employment under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 26
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text - Chapter - Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM