Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Elections - Early Voting Centers MC 14-16
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring Montgomery County to have 10 early voting centers; and providing the Act shall be applied to and interpreted to require that Montgomery County have 10 early voting centers for the 2016 election cycle and that the tenth early voting center be located at the Potomac Community Recreation Center, if available, or if not, at another facility that serves the Potomac area community.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {275960/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {275960/1 Report Adopted 15
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 17
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 18
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Returned Passed 33
Post Passage 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM