Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Barve, DeBoy, Krebs, and Malone
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the day on which interest begins to accrue on specified taxpayer refunds from the 45th day after a refund claim is filed to the date the overpayment is made; allowing interest to accrue on a taxpayer refund from the 45th day after the claim is filed if the claim for a refund is based on an error or mistake of the claimant not attributable to the State; repealing a specified prohibition on a tax collector paying interest on specified refunds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0100
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/22/2013 Text - First - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM