Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Preapproval for Use of Trade Names - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Pendergrass
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law that condition the use of specified trade names by specified chiropractors, massage therapists, and massage practitioners on preapproval of the use by the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 33
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-407, 3-5A-12 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM