Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student Enrollment
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Afzali, Ciliberti, Kittleman, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing eligibility for a county board of education to receive a specified State grant; requiring a specified grant to be provided to eligible county boards in fiscal years 2017 and 2018; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; requiring the Governor to transfer specified funds for fiscal year 2017 to eligible counties in a specified year under specified circumstances; and requiring specified funds to be provided in a specified fiscal year if specified funds are not transferred.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1146
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM