Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Foresters in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to a specified date the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before a specified date.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0236
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Reassigned to Economic Matters 12
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM