Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, Arentz, Cassilly, Impallaria, Jacobs, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Parrott, Ready, Szeliga, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Abolishing the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services within the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing for the transfer of property, assets, licenses, credits, and rights of the Baltimore City Detention Center to the Mayor of Baltimore City; requiring the State to pay all the operating and capital costs of the Baltimore City Detention Center in fiscal years 2016 through 2018 and one-half the costs in 2019; providing that Baltimore City pay all the operating and capital costs in fiscal year 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0268
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015, January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-304, 10-701, 10-801, 1-101, 11-101, 11-704, 5-101, 5-102, 5-201, 5-202, 5-203, 5-301, 5-302, 5-401 through 5-406, 9-106, 9-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM