Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsored by
Delegate Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the membership of the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to five members; requiring that each member of the Board represent a different legislative district in the county; requiring that the Governor appoint members who have lived in their district for at least 6 months immediately before appointment; requiring that no more than three members may belong to the same political party; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0129
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-102, 11-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM