Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
Sponsored by
Delegate Malone
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment or the Board of Public Works from terminating or impairing the riparian rights of an individual, community association, or other entity through the application process for a permit or license to install a pier.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0021
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-201.1 )
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 10:31 AM