Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landowner whose land is subject to an agricultural land preservation easement from granting, or allowing a person to establish, an overlay easement, a right-of-way, or any other servitude on the land without prior written permission of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation; and authorizing the Foundation to approve an overlay easement, a right-of-way, or any other servitude on land subject to an agricultural land preservation easement under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM