Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain entities from authorizing the use of a master meter for certain services in certain residential multiple occupancy buildings in Prince George's County; establishing the Task Force on the Use of Master Meters for Utility Services in Prince George's County to study certain issues, including the amount of money owed by unit owners related to the use of water meters, and to report its findings to the Governor and Prince George's County Delegation of the General Assembly by December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Utility Services - Master Meters PG 429-18
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593999/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - Utility Services - Master Meters PG 429-18
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {593999/1 Adopted 33
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 35
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Finance 36
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Text - Chapter - Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-202, 7-304.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM