Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Cullison, Pena-Melnyk, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding an adult grandchild of a certain decedent to the list of persons who have the right to arrange for the final disposition of the body of the decedent; requiring a person to forfeit the right of final disposition of a decedent and that right pass to the next qualifying person under certain circumstances; providing that a certain person's right of disposition may be restored under certain circumstances; authorizing a person to waive the right of final disposition; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0147
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {686189/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {347776/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {686189/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {347776/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM