Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Cardin, Hixson, Howard, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Stukes, F. Turner, and Walker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to institute an action in a circuit court for injunctive relief to prohibit a person from engaging in or continuing to engage in specified violations of election law; providing that injunctive relief may be granted under the Act only to prevent specified violations of election law from affecting a pending election; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {115667/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-45)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {115667/1 Adopted 42
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (91-45) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-1003, 16-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM