Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the termination date for the credit against the State income tax for the employment of an eligible apprentice to January 1, 2025, under certain circumstances; providing that Section 2 of Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2017 shall remain effective until June 30, 2025; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page