Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Serafini, Anderson, Barkley, Beitzel, Carr, Conaway, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, Kramer, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, B. Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness; specifying the membership of the Commission; providing for the appointment of a Senate cochair and House cochair of the Commission; providing for the staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving compensation but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study, consider, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring a report on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0073
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0554 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM