Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Whistleblower Protections
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Conaway, Glenn, B. Robinson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a supervisor, an appointing authority, and the head of a law enforcement agency from threatening or taking specified retaliatory actions against a specified law enforcement officer under specified circumstances; authorizing a law enforcement officer aggrieved by a specified violation of the Act to file a civil action against a specified law enforcement agency for specified relief; authorizing that, instead of specified relief, the law enforcement officer may seek specified statutory damages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1187 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801 through 3-806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM