Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morales, Platt, Reznik, Shoemaker, Valentino-Smith, B. Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from distributing heroin or fentanyl, the use of which is a contributing cause of the death of another; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act of up to 30 years in prison; providing that it is not a defense that the defendant did not directly distribute the heroin or fentanyl to the decedent; establishing a specified immunity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0303
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {172711/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {863025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/31/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {172711/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {863025/1 Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted 46
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais) 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-602.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM