Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderson, Barve, Bobo, Carr, Carter, Cullison, Davis, Donoghue, Feldman, Glenn, Griffith, Hammen, Hubbard, Hucker, A. Kelly, Lee, McIntosh, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, V. Turner, Vallario, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility requirements for the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the definition of "former foster care adolescent" to conform to federal eligibility requirements; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide specified grants; adding to the purposes for which a specified assessment in hospital rates may be used; exempting the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and its employees from specified provisions of law governing third party administrators; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0274
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, January 1, 2014, January 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {776480/1
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {976886/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-43)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {776480/1 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {976886/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (47-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-103, 19-143, 19-214 )
(   14-502, 14-504, 15-1303, 15-140, 27-405, 31-101, 31-103, 31-106, 31-107, 31-107.1, 31-107.2, 31-108, 31-111, 31-112, 31-113, 31-113.1, 31-114, 31-115, 31-116, 31-117, 31-119, 6-101, 6-103.2, 8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM