Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for Interns
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barve, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Reznik, Smith, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, B. Wilson, Zucker, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Hayes, Hill, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing specified protections for interns and applicants for internships from specified discriminatory acts; providing that a specified intern has access to a specified complaint resolution procedure or, under specified circumstances, may file a complaint with the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights for specified nonmonetary administrative remedies; providing that the Act does not create an employment relationship between an employer and an intern for the purposes of specified remedies or specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0604
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {346380/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {346380/1 Report Adopted 36
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 38
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-601, 20-610 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM